CT HB05299 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To address barriers to employment for military families by requiring that state licensing authorities accept military training and experience, where appropriate, as a substitute for additional training and by allowing spouses to gain streamlined occupational certifications.
Title
An Act Concerning The Findings Of The Military Occupational Specialty Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 425 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-131 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | House | File Number 719 |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 531 |
2014-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4526 |
2014-04-16 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-09 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2014-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2014-03-27 | House | File Number 153 |
2014-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 112 |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |