CT HB05297 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate Calendar Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate Calendar Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require recommendations for revisions to the state's environmental justice law that would prevent the further citing of numerous affecting facilities in environmental justice communities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Multiplicity Of Affecting Facilities In Certain Census Block Groups In The State.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 503 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 457 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 337 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |