CT HB05287 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the production and sale of acidified food products on residential farms.
Title
An Act Allowing The Production And Sale Of Acidified Food Products On Residential Farms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-20 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on General Law | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 363 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 196 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |