CT HB05286 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate moneys to the Department of Veterans affairs for purposes of (1) driver's license and identity card renewals at department-sponsored events, (2) public awareness campaigns, (3) Internet web site updates and maintenance, and (4) publication of a municipal veterans' services directory.
Title
An Act Appropriating Funds To The Department Of Veterans Affairs For Various Measures To Support And Assist Veterans.
Sponsors
House Veterans' and Military Affairs Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | File Number 143 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 124 |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |