CT HB05286 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the import and sale of personal cosmetic products that contain microbeads.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Import And Sale Of Cosmetics That Contain Microbeads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 340 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 652 |
2015-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-06-02 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9307 |
2015-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-21 | House | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 510 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 316 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2015-02-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |