CT HB05245 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for embryo, oocyte and sperm cryopreservation procedures for an insured who has been diagnosed with cancer but has not started cancer treatment.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Fertility Preservation For Cancer Patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | House | File Number 341 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 203 |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |