CT HB05232 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - File Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - File Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a program through which qualified attorneys-at-law can provide certain legal services at no cost to military service members and their families.
Title
An Act Concerning Legal Representation For Military Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | File Number 40 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 60 |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |