CT HB05208 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the partnership of state and local governments in economic development and help ensure that economic development projects are approved as quickly as possible.
Title
An Act Concerning The Permit And Regulatory Authority Of The Department Of Environmental Protection And Establishing An Office Of The Permit Ombudsman Within The Department Of Economic And Community Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 395 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-24 | Public Act 10-158 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 569 | |
2010-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5580 | |
2010-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 419 | |
2010-04-08 | House Calendar Number 212 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-03-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |