CT HB05177 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the sale and use by consumers of certain nonaerial and nonexplosive consumer fireworks.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale And Use Of Certain Nonaerial And Nonexplosive Consumer Fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-18 | House | File Number 45 |
2024-03-18 | House | House Calendar Number 61 |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |