CT HB05177 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the deadline by which a municipality must submit its plan for land value taxation from December 31, 2015, to December 31, 2016.
Title
An Act Extending The Deadline For The Land Value Taxation Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | House | Public Act 16-80 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 389 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | File Number 41 |
2016-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 59 |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |