CT HB05162 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to establish the Learn Here, Live Here program to help graduates of any institution of higher education or certain certificate programs of private occupational schools save toward a down payment on their first home in the state by segregating a portion of their state income tax payments for up to ten years after they graduate.
Title
An Act Requiring The Establishment Of The Learn Here, Live Here Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-03-06 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-03-05 | House | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |