CT HB05157 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit nonprofit organizations to advertise their bazaar or raffle by posting an advertisement on the organization's Internet web site, sending an advertisement via electronic mail or posting one or more lawn signs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Advertisement Of Bazaars And Raffles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-04-29 | Public Act 10-10 | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 382 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-31 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-25 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-03-11 | File Number 18 | |
2010-03-11 | House Calendar Number 38 | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-02-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety |