CT HB05153 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the percentage of workforce housing opportunity development project units that shall be rented at market rate and to eligible workforce populations.
Title
An Act Concerning Eligibility For Workforce Housing Development Projects.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3792 |
2024-03-14 | House | File Number 33 |
2024-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 54 |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |