CT HB05142 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a stewardship program for the return and recycling of certain common consumer gas cylinders.
Title
An Act Concerning Extended Producer Responsibility For Certain Gas Cylinders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | House | Public Act 22-27 |
2022-05-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-18 | House | File Number 510 |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 365 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4561 |
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 58 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 87 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |