CT HB05125 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study the economic benefits or issues relating to livestock processing facilities in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Economic Development Considerations Related To Livestock Processing Facilities In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 32 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 71 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |