CT HB05122 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit housing providers from considering a prospective tenant's criminal conviction after certain time periods.
Title
An Act Considering Consideration Of Criminal Convictions Of A Prospective Tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |