CT HB05092 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent litter, the blockage of catch basins and limit sales solicitations.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Distribution Of Unsolicited Marketing Flyers To Homes.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Kim Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-19 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-13 | House | File Number 48 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 42 |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-01-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |