CT HB05081 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a level playing field among municipalities seeking funding from the Clean Water Fund for phosphorous reducing water pollution control projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Phosphorous Reduction Reimbursements To Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-05 | House | Public Act 14-13 |
2014-04-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-30 | House | Rules Suspended |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 497 |
2014-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-14 | House | File Number 525 |
2014-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 332 |
2014-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |