CO SJR033 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Convening Date For 2015 Legislative Session
Title
Convening Date For 2015 Legislative Session
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-05-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/05/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/29/2014 - No Amendments |