CO SJR006 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of February 4 as "Missing Persons Day" in Colorado.
Title
Missing Persons Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/04/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sjr20-006 |
Text | https://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_sjr006_01.pdf |