CO SJR004 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Projects Revolving Fund Eligibility Lists
Title
Water Projects Revolving Fund Eligibility Lists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-004 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |