CO SB289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a cash fund consisting of certain money that the state receives from the federal coronavirus state fiscal recovery fund so that the money is available for appropriation only in other legislation.
Title
Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-289, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-289, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |