CO SB284 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 08/07/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 08/07/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voter Approval TIF Payments Ag Land
Title
Voter Approval TIF Payments Ag Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment H) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 08/07/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |