CO SB281 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning holding Colorado government accountable for creating sanctuary jurisdiction policies.
Title
Hold Colorado Government Accountable Sanctuary Jurisdictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-281 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-281 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-281 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |