CO SB275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of seaplanes to operate in Colorado.
Title
Evaluate Prerequisites Seaplane Operation In Colorado
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Rep. Jovan Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-275 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Postpone Senate Bill 18-275 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-275 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Postpone Senate Bill 18-275 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-275 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |