CO SB275 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protections Information Provided General Assembly
Title
Protections Information Provided General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Page 3, line 9, strike "INDIVIDUALY, line 10, strike "IDENTIFIABLE" and substitute "REDACTED" The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |