CO SB245 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a twenty-one-day notice requirement in tenancies of one month or more but less than six months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tenancies One Month To One Year Notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05 Governor Signed
2017-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2017-03-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-245
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/slg2017a2017-03-23t110303z-sb17-245-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/slg2017a2017-03-23t110303z-sb17-245-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/slg2017a2017-03-23t110303z-sb17-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#607
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hlg2017a2017-04-12t133158z-sb17-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#944

Bill Comments

feedback