CO SB245 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher Ed Educator Preparation Programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Ed Educator Preparation Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Refer Senate Bill 11-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-23 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-18 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-16 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-11 House Third Reading Passed
2011-05-10 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2011-05-06 House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-05-03 Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
2011-05-02 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-04-29 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2011-04-28 Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-04-21 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/62D9FB44048D63E5872578640052A500/$FILE/245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EAD4B9FCAA2B408B872578800071496F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/606005E32C99675487257888006F6E62
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EAD4B9FCAA2B408B872578800071496F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/606005E32C99675487257888006F6E62
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EAD4B9FCAA2B408B872578800071496F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/606005E32C99675487257888006F6E62

Bill Comments

feedback