CO SB235 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transfer of electronic records by voter registration agencies in order to register voters, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Automatic Voter Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |