CO SB210 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Title Insurance Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title Insurance Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual to CF instead of GF The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to page 7, line 8. Strike "shall" and substitute "may" (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-210, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2015-05-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
2015-03-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210sblt_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210sbltfin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210sbltfinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210fin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CA1C3D1F8EA2FC3887257DE000593033/$FILE/210_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/27544BCAF9FFBBD187257E2F00806B54
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/27544BCAF9FFBBD187257E2F00806B54
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F30523ED975CB95687257E2F007F4032
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CA34448F29A7C7E87257E2F007EEB2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/80233E117B598B7C87257E2F007F3349
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/33EED6EEDBA5C7EA87257E2F007FD751
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/30CA05FFB092FC3087257E2F007FB239
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2F7C88E25397474787257E2F007F488B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1F825B942BF4A45187257E2F00802C01
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1E05B7DB47BE70B587257E2F007F4FBD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/077B9B323F2BD78287257E2F007F5687
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BD2E22D8B7BB673A87257E35007DAD32
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/230EFFD5993C81E787257E35007DA4C9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A94F3B3E7ABDB7A87257E3700694B9C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3FDC19EA88A2205887257E370069E85C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/987E1822FD281A7487257E3C006E74B9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C813B64B93F3BE5487257E3C007A54BD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9A8889CEE7EE87F687257E3C007A63E2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE9A74C195D6355787257E3C006E576D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1DE3AFAFE5B0A34087257E3C006E67E2

Bill Comments

feedback