CO SB210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Phase Out Supplemental OAP Health Fund
Title
Phase Out Supplemental OAP Health Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-15 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-13 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-12 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2011-04-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |