CO SB192 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uranium Processing Groundwater Protection
Title
Uranium Processing Groundwater Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Rep. Jon Becker [R] | Rep. Jared Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.014, strike "FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY DAYS" and insert "THREE HUNDRED SIXTY DAYS" (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.010, line 9 after the period insert " PROCESSING" DOES NOT INCLUDE CONVENTIONAL OPEN OR UNDERGROUND MINING TECHNIQUES PERMITTED UNDER ARTICLE 32 OF TITLE 34, C.R.S." The motion passed without obje (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.014, strike "FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY DAYS" and insert "THREE HUNDRED SIXTY DAYS" (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.010, line 9 after the period insert " PROCESSING" DOES NOT INCLUDE CONVENTIONAL OPEN OR UNDERGROUND MINING TECHNIQUES PERMITTED UNDER ARTICLE 32 OF TITLE 34, C.R.S." The motion passed without obje (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |