CO SB183 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a modification of the definition of "state agency" for purposes of the statewide internet portal authority to ensure that the authority is authorized to serve all state government agencies.
Title
Definition Of State Agency For SIPA Statewide Internet Portal Authority Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-183 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-183 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |