CO SB174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a change in management responsibility of certain existing display space in the Colorado convention center available for the promotion of the state.
Title
Change Management Of State Convention Display Space
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 20-174 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |