CO SB174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Promote Geothermal Energy Development
Title
Promote Geothermal Energy Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-174 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-174 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-12 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy |