CO SB167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of child care centers.
Title
Regulation Of Child Care Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-20 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |