CO SB137 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certification of Workers' Compensation Forms
Title
Certification of Workers' Compensation Forms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |