CO SB137 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Senate Second Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Senate Second Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gold And Silver Coin For Payment Of Debts
Title
Gold And Silver Coin For Payment Of Debts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-137 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Senate Second Reading Lost | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |