CO SB121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a separate health facility license for critical access hospitals, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Licensure of Critical Access Hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-121 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-121 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |