CO SB117 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorize Regulation Real Estate Appraisers
Title
Reauthorize Regulation Real Estate Appraisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |