CO SB116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the issuance of capitol identification cards to members of the public to permit them entry to state buildings containing the legislative branch of state government without having to submit to personal security checks.
Title
Capitol Identification Card
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-116 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-116 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-116 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-116, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |