CO SB110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recommendations For Financing Capital Construction
Title
Recommendations For Financing Capital Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |