CO SB104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the alignment of educational programs with registered apprenticeships, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Career & Technical Education & Apprenticeships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |