CO SB096 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Community Living Centers In Colorado
Title
Veterans Community Living Centers In Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-096 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |