CO SB079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that certain practitioners prescribe controlled substances electronically.
Title
Electronic Prescribing Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/15/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |