CO SB079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning classifying sake as a vinous liquor for the purposes of the "Colorado Liquor Code".
Title
Sake Vinous Liquor Colorado Liquor Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |