CO SB079 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mesa State College Program Authority
Title
Mesa State College Program Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |