CO SB065 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the career development success program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Career Development Success Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-065 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-065 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |