CO SB058 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the enactment of the Colorado Revised Statutes 2018 as the positive and statutory law of the state of Colorado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enactment of CRS 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-058 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-058 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20 Governor Signed
2019-02-11 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-16SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-058
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_058_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0d3846fff7a01d7872583840076640c-sb19-058-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-058vote5aae7c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34d27f345f9d2d8d872583920001d3ae-sb19-058-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-058vote5a8a07

Bill Comments

feedback