CO SB052 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning aligning medical assistance income eligibility requirements with federal law.
Title
Medical Assistance Income Eligibility Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |